Imerys board of directors
WitrynaUlysses Paris Kyriacopoulos Director, Imerys SA. Ulysses Paris Kyriacopoulos is a Greek businessperson who has been the head of 9 different companies. Witryna31 gru 2024 · Imerys extracts, transforms, develops and combines a unique range of minerals to provide functionalities that are key to its customers' products and …
Imerys board of directors
Did you know?
WitrynaBusiness acumen and Technical understanding on Pulp, Paper & Board Packaging industries; Cooperation with Imerys colleagues in other departments outside P&P (e.g. CS, S&T, Logistics, Production, Legal, Communication, …) and outside Imerys (e.g external service providers) Application must be sent in English Witryna1 lut 2024 · Born 1956. Master of Science, Naval Architecture, from Helsinki University of Technology. Board member since 2024. Nationality: Finnish. Current appointments. …
WitrynaCalderys is the leading downstream business division of French conglomerate Imerys having interests in mining, performance minerals, mineral processing and … Witryna13 lut 2024 · Imerys S.A. announced that the appointment of new Managing Director in the person of Alessandro Dazza, who will be joining on the 17th of February 2024. …
WitrynaBoard of Directors. Name/Title Current Board Membership; Dominique Morin Director: Imerys SA: Carlos Manuel Pérez Fernández Director: Imerys SA: Bernard-Pierre … Witryna28 paź 2024 · Imerys’ Board of Directors has accepted at a meeting on Monday, October 21, 2024, the resignation of Mr. Conrad Keijzer, from his role of Chief …
Witryna28 maj 2024 · On October 22, 2014, he became Chief Executive Officer of TOTAL S.A. and Chairman of the Company’s Executive Committee. On May 29, 2015, he was …
WitrynaImerys S.A. is a French multinational company which specialises in the production and processing of industrial minerals. ... Since June 2024, Patrick Kron has served as … dundalk fabrication and coatingWitrynaNadine Relier-David. Anne Rigail. Loïk Segalen. Anne-Claire Taittinger. Ann Taylor. Eric Trappier. Marie-Françoise Walbaum. Pour plus d’informations sur le conseil … dundalk fc appoint operationsWitryna7.5 Imerys stock market information 294 7.6 Dividends 296 7.7 Relations with shareholders 296 7.8 Parent company/subsidiary organization 297 8 Ordinary and … dundalk family dentistryWitryna5 paź 2024 · 2 February 18, 2024 Imerys 2024 Annual Results May 10, 2024 Ordinary General Meeting Disclaimer More comprehensive information about Imerys may be … dundalk fc v bohemians dublin fcWitrynaIn 2024, Patrick Kron was appointed Chairman of Imerys. He is also Chairman of private equity firm Truffle Capital since November 2016 and Chairman of PKC&I SAS. He … dundalk fabricationsWitryna10 kwi 2024 · Identify sales development targets, elaborate and implement appropriate development strategy. Ensure forecast accuracy and jointly manage customer relationship with Customer Service Team. Job Requirements: Bachelor’s Degree in Material Engineering or Business related field or equivalent experience. Minimum 5 … dundalk fire houseWitrynaImerys' Board of Directors includes Patrick Kron and 11 others. Team members. Aldo Cardoso. Director. Annette Messemer. Director. Carlos Manuel Pérez ... Director. … dundalk fire service